This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 02:13:26 (UTC).

SHANICE AMANNI CORTEZ VS YVETTE DESHAWN HARMON

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 SHANICE AMANNI CORTEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YVETTE DESHAWN HARMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8598

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTEZ SHANICE AMANNI

Defendant

HARMON YVETTE DESHAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORMAN RONALD A.

Defendant Attorney

FREED LEESA ANN

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/4/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/3/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/11/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/12/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2024
  • Hearing07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yvette Deshawn Harmon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Yvette Deshawn Harmon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Shanice Amanni Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shanice Amanni Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shanice Amanni Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shanice Amanni Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED LEESA A. ESQ.