Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 21:02:34 (UTC).

SHANGLE, GABRIEL ADAM VS CHOW, SANDY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 SHANGLE, GABRIEL ADAM filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CHOW, SANDY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VEASEY, GLENDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0019

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VEASEY, GLENDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHANGLE GABRIEL ADAM

Respondent

CHOW SANDY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/1/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

1/22/2021: Proof of Service

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

1/14/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

1/14/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/14/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/14/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/14/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Case Assignment

1/14/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less