This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2022 at 14:55:25 (UTC).

SHAMIKA SMITH,, INDIVIDUALLY, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 SHAMIKA SMITH,, INDIVIDUALLY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4563

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUCKSWORTH LANECIA INDIVIDUALLY

LANECIA DUCKSWORTH AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO LARRY P. SMITH DECEASED

LARRY PAUL SMITH II AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO LARRY P. SMITH DECEASED

SHAMIKA SMITH AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO LARRY P. SMITH DECEASED

SMITH II LARRY P. INDIVIDUALLY

SMITH SHAMIKA INDIVIDUALLY

Defendants

ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC. DBA SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT HOLLYWOOD A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT HOLLYWOOD A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEREPINSKIY DMITRIY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/29/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Complaint

7/29/2022: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/29/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF SHAMIKA SMITH AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 377.32

7/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF SHAMIKA SMITH AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 377.32

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF LANECIA DUCKSWORTH AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 377.32

7/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF LANECIA DUCKSWORTH AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 377.32

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF LARRY PAUL SMITH, II AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 377.32

7/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF LARRY PAUL SMITH, II AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 377.32

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2024
  • Hearing07/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2024
  • Hearing01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2024
  • Hearing01/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shamika Smith,, individually (Plaintiff); Lanecia Ducksworth,, individually (Plaintiff); Larry P. Smith, II, individually (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Plaintiff Shamika Smith as Successor-in-Interest Pursuant to CCP section 377.32); Filed by Shamika Smith,, individually (Plaintiff); Lanecia Ducksworth,, individually (Plaintiff); Larry P. Smith, II, individually (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Plaintiff Larry Paul Smith, II as Successor-in-Interest Pursuant to CCP section 377.32); Filed by Shamika Smith,, individually (Plaintiff); Lanecia Ducksworth,, individually (Plaintiff); Larry P. Smith, II, individually (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shamika Smith,, individually (Plaintiff); Lanecia Ducksworth,, individually (Plaintiff); Larry P. Smith, II, individually (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shamika Smith,, individually (Plaintiff); Lanecia Ducksworth,, individually (Plaintiff); Larry P. Smith, II, individually (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Plaintiff Lanecia Ducksworth as Successor-in-Interest Pursuant to CCP section 377.32); Filed by Shamika Smith,, individually (Plaintiff); Lanecia Ducksworth,, individually (Plaintiff); Larry P. Smith, II, individually (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEREPINSKIY DMITRIY