This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 14:34:00 (UTC).

SHAMBRIA WILLIAMS VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 SHAMBRIA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4381

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS SHAMBRIA

Defendants

GUSTAFSON JEFFREY ALLAN

GUSTAFSON LOGISTICS INC.

RAISER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ DARIO C.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

7/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2024
  • Hearing06/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Hearing12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Hearing12/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shambria Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shambria Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shambria Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shambria Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RAISER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOMEZ DARIO C.