This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2019 at 09:08:14 (UTC).

SHALON L ENNIS ET AL VS CARPENTERS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 SHALON L ENNIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARPENTERS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2841

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

MCLEMORE LATASHA

ENNIS LYNTTE

MOORE ANTHONY

ENNIS SHALON L.

TAYLOR RALPH

TAYLOR TANIQUE

BROWNER KHALA

Defendants and Respondents

GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

PAMA MANAGEMENT INC.

CARPENTERS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

I.E. RENTALS

I E RENTAL HOMES INC.

EQUITY HOLDING CORP.

Minors

COUNCIL SHAMANI

CAMPER JAQUOIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

OHN GERALD S. ESQ.

OHN GERALD SANG ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WILLIAMS WARREN M.

YUKEVICH-CAVANAUGH

WILLIAMS WARREN MCKAY

DANNA VICTORIA LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Order - ORDER RE GROUP XIII PROPERTIES, LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT INC. AND IE RENTAL HOMES, INC'S MSJ

8/8/2019: Order - ORDER RE GROUP XIII PROPERTIES, LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT INC. AND IE RENTAL HOMES, INC'S MSJ

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

8/8/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 5

8/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 5

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3

8/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 4

8/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 4

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 6

8/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 6

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1

8/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2

8/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,...)

8/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,...)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DENYING DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCUS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ADJUDICATION

8/12/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DENYING DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCUS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ADJUDICATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/14/2019

8/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/14/2019

Notice of Settlement

8/14/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LATASHA MCLEMORE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGM

7/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LATASHA MCLEMORE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGM

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHALON L. ENNIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN

7/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHALON L. ENNIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAMELA TAMMY A. PRIETO, ESQ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCS MOTION FOR SUM

7/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAMELA TAMMY A. PRIETO, ESQ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCS MOTION FOR SUM

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GERALD S. OHN, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GERALD S. OHN, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP, PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC., AND I E RENTAL HOMES, INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shalon L. Ennis (Plaintiff); Khala Browner (Plaintiff); Tanique Taylor (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:12 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Shalon L. Ennis (Plaintiff); Jaquoia Camper (Legacy Party); Shamani Council (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Shalon L. Ennis (Plaintiff); Lyntte Ennis (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shalon L. Ennis (Plaintiff); Khala Browner (Plaintiff); Tanique Taylor (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692841    Hearing Date: May 25, 2021    Dept: 50

 

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

Shalon l. Ennis, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

carpenters property management, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC692841

Hearing Date:

May 25, 2021

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

ORDER RE:

PETITIONS TO APPROVE MINORS’ COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Background

Plaintiff Shalon L. Ennis, individually and as guardian ad litem for minor plaintiffs Jaquoia Camper and Shamani Council, and adult plaintiffs Khala Browner, Tanique Taylor, Anthony Moore, Latasha Mclemore, and Ralph Taylor filed this action against defendants Carpenter Property Management, Equity Holding Corp., Group XIII Properties LP, Pama Management, Inc., and I E Rental Homes, Inc on February 5, 2018.

Plaintiffs allege causes of action for (1) breach of implied warranty of habitability, (2) negligence, (3) nuisance, and (4) violations of Civil Code § 1942.4 arising from Plaintiffs’ tenancy at Defendants’ 38019 10th St. E, Palmdale, California 93550 property.

Discussion

An enforceable settlement of a minor's claim can only be consummated with court approval. (Prob. Code, § 3500.) The petition must be verified by the petitioner, must contain a full disclosure of all information that has any bearing upon the reasonableness of the compromise, and must be prepared on judicial council form MC-350. (CRC 7.950.)

Petitioner Shalon L. Ennis petitions the Court to approve the compromise of disputed claims entered between Defendant Carpenters Property Management, Equity Holding Corp., Group XIII Properties LP, Pama Management, Inc., I E Rental Homes, Inc. and minor plaintiffs Jaquoia Camper and Shamani Council.

The petitions are prepared on form MC-350 and are verified by Petitioner. By way of settlement, Defendants Carpenters Property Management and Equity Holding Corp have agreed to pay each minor plaintiff $3,000, and Group XIII Properties LP, Pama Management, Inc. and I E Rental Homes have agreed to pay each minor plaintiff $250. (Forms MC-350 §§ 12.) Thus, each minor plaintiff is to receive a total of $3,250 under the parties’ settlement agreement. The adult plaintiffs are to receive a total of $116,000.

Of the $3,250, counsel for plaintiffs request $812.50, which represents 25% of the settlement. The court finds this amount fair and reasonable, and leaves a balance of $2,437.50 for Shamani Council, and a balance of $2,311.50 for Jaquoia Camper after deduction of $126 for a medical lien. Accordingly, the Court finds that the settlement appears fair and reasonable and in the best interest of the minor plaintiffs.

Proposed orders on forms MC-351 have been filed, and all relevant filings have been served on the defendants in this action.

Conclusion

Based on the foregoing, the Court grants the petitions and approves of the compromise of the instant action. The proposed orders to deposit money into blocked accounts will be signed and entered forthwith.

Petitioner is to give notice of this ruling.

DATED: May 25, 2021 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARPENTERS PROPERTY MGMT. A DIV OF PLATINUM WORKS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GROUP XIII PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY HOLDINGS CORP AS TRUSTEE FOR PADUA LANE TRUST DATED 09/15/2007 is a litigant

Latest cases where IE RENTALS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant