This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 02:11:20 (UTC).

SHAHRYAR YADEGAR VS COMPLETE REMODELING AND CONSTRUCTION ET

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 a Property - Other Property Fraud case was filed by SHAHRYAR YADEGAR against COMPLETE REMODELING AND CONSTRUCTION ET in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8395

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

OTHER DISTRICT JUDGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YADEGAR SHAHRYAR

Defendant

COMPLETE REMODELING AND CONSTRUCTION

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

4/11/2018: Legacy Document

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons

4/11/2018: Summons

Minute Order

6/26/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

7/18/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

7/25/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

8/29/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/29/2018: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/14/2018: Answer

Minute Order

11/6/2018: Minute Order

Separate Statement

1/7/2019: Separate Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/23/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

5/6/2019: Stipulation and Order

Ex Parte Application

5/22/2019: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

5/24/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

6/4/2019: Minute Order

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Application to Continue Trial, Final Status Conferen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by SHAHRYAR YADEGAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF, SHAHRYAR YADEGAR'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FIN...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (PLAINTIFF , SHAHRYAR YADEGAR'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES); Filed by SHAHRYAR YADEGAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF); Filed by SHAHRYAR YADEGAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department NCGE, Other District Judge, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH TRIALCOURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT) - Court makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC068395    Hearing Date: December 27, 2019    Dept: E

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

[CCP §284, CRC 3.1362]

Date: 12/27/19

Case: Yadegar v. Complete Remodeling and Constr. Services, Inc. (EC 068395)

TENTATIVE RULING:

At the hearing, upon confirmation by counsel for defendant of defendant Complete Remodeling and Construction Services Inc.’s current or last known address and telephone number, the Court will GRANT James L. Tenner’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel.

Defendant Complete Remodeling and Constructions Services Inc. is ordered to appear at 8:30 AM, on 1/29/20 in Department E of the Glendale Courthouse to show cause why its operative Answer to the Complaint should not be stricken on account of its status as an unrepresented corporate entity.