This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:59:21 (UTC).

SHAHROKH JAVED VS RAYTHEON COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 SHAHROKH JAVED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RAYTHEON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9287

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JAVED SHAHROKH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

RAYTHEON COMPANY

TAVENNER SEAN

BRISENO NAOMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BEROKIM & DUEL P.C.

V. JAMES DESIMONE LAW

DUEL JASMINE AZIZA

DESIMONE VINCENT JAMES

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RONK STEPHEN E. ESQ.

RONK STEPHEN EARL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/6/2019: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/7/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

6/22/2018: Minute Order

AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS RAYTHEON COMPANY, SEAN TAVENNER, AND NAOMI BRISENO'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIRED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

8/27/2018: DEFENDANTS RAYTHEON COMPANY, SEAN TAVENNER, AND NAOMI BRISENO'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIRED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Minute Order

9/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/9/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

11/9/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Lodging

4/5/2019: Notice of Lodging

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/5/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/5/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration

5/7/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

5/8/2019: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS RAYTHEON COMPANY, SEAN TAVENNER, AND NAOMI BRISENO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/4/2018: DEFENDANTS RAYTHEON COMPANY, SEAN TAVENNER, AND NAOMI BRISENO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/10/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

4/2/2018: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RACE/ETHNICITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

3/22/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RACE/ETHNICITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Conference (Re Mediation Setting) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 42; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Shahrokh Javed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shahrokh Javed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RACE/ETHNICITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699287    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 58

JUDGE JOHN P. DOYLE

DEPARTMENT 58

Hearing Date: December 3, 2019

Case Name: Javed v. Raytheon Company, et al.

Case No.: BC699287

Motion: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication

Moving Party: Defendants Raytheon Company, Sean Tavenner, and Naomi Briseno

Opposing Party: Plaintiff Shahrokh Javed

Tentative Ruling: The Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication is denied.

This is an action arising from Plaintiff’s employment as a software engineer. On March 22, 2018, Plaintiff filed the operative Complaint for (1) FEHA race discrimination, (2) FEHA religious discrimination, (3) FEHA disability discrimination, (4) FEHA failure to engage in the interactive process, (5) FEHA failure to provide reasonable accommodations, (6) FEHA harassment, (7) FEHA retaliation, (8) FEHA failure to prevent discrimination, retaliation, and harassment, (9) wrongful termination, and (10) intentional infliction of emotional distress (“IIED”).

Defendants Raytheon Company, Sean Tavenner, and Naomi Briseno seek summary judgment or, alternatively, summary adjudication of all causes of action as well as Plaintiff’s request for punitive damages. Defendants argue, inter alia, that (1) Plaintiff cannot establish a prima facie case of discrimination or retaliation; (2) there is no evidence of pretext as to the decision to terminate Plaintiff for substandard performance; (3) Plaintiff received the accommodations he requested; (4) there was no severe or pervasive conduct constituting harassment; (5) there was no extreme or outrageous conduct constituting IIED; and (6) because there was no harassment, discrimination, or retaliation, there cannot be any claim for failure to prevent such wrongs, wrongful termination, or punitive damages.

The Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication is denied because there are triable issues of fact (see, e.g., Plaintiff’s Separate Statement of Undisputed Fact ¶¶ 16, 19, 24, 26, 31, 33, 36, 53-54, 56, 58, 60), or else Defendants failed to carry their burden.