This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 03:09:31 (UTC).

SHAHRAM JEFF JAVIDZAD VS SPROUT MORTGAGE CORPORATION., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 SHAHRAM JEFF JAVIDZAD filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SPROUT MORTGAGE CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1076

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAVIDZAD SHAHRAM JEFF

SHAHRAM JEFF JAVIDZAD AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE JM TRUST

MONICA NOURMAN JAVIDZAD AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE JM JAVIDZAD 2008 TRUST

Defendants

SPROUT MORTGAGE CORPORATION.

PRESTIGE DEFAULT SERVICES LLC

SPROUT LENDING LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SPROUT LENDING LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FAY SERVICING AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM AND CITIZENSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIVOLI MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

WITCHER RACHEL CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION

7/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. VIVOLI

7/2/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. VIVOLI

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION; DECLARATION OF RACHEL C. WITCHER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

7/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION; DECLARATION OF RACHEL C. WITCHER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/19/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTI...)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTI...) OF 01/12/2021

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTI...) OF 01/12/2021

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

1/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

Case Management Statement

1/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Exhibit List

2/8/2021: Exhibit List

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. VIVOLI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES

2/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. VIVOLI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES

Motion to Consolidate

2/8/2021: Motion to Consolidate

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/8/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Hearing08/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion - Other to Consolidate Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Advance Motion to Consolidate) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Motion to Consolidate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Errata Re: Defendant's Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Motion for Consolidation); Filed by Sprout Lending, LLC, a Delaware limited liability Company (Defendant); Fay Servicing, an entity of unknown form and citizenship (Defendant); Sprout Mortgage Corporation. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Advance Hearing Date on Motion for Consolidation; Declaration of Michael W. Vivoli); Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad, as Co-Trustee of the JM September 18, 2008 Trust dated September 18, 2008 (Plaintiff); Monica Nourman Javidzad, as Co-Trustee of the JM Javidzad 2008 Trust Dated September 18, 2008 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad, as Co-Trustee of the JM September 18, 2008 Trust dated September 18, 2008 (Plaintiff); Monica Nourman Javidzad, as Co-Trustee of the JM Javidzad 2008 Trust Dated September 18, 2008 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOpposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION; DECLARATION OF RACHEL C. WITCHER IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Sprout Lending, LLC, a Delaware limited liability Company (Defendant); Fay Servicing, an entity of unknown form and citizenship (Defendant); Sprout Mortgage Corporation. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad, as Co-Trustee of the JM September 18, 2008 Trust dated September 18, 2008 (Plaintiff); Monica Nourman Javidzad, as Co-Trustee of the JM Javidzad 2008 Trust Dated September 18, 2008 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketObjection (to Defendant Prestige Default Services, LLC's Declaration of Non-Monetary Status); Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Prestige Default Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Monetary Status); Filed by Prestige Default Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint ((Verfied) to Quiet Title and for Damages and Injunctive Relief); Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shahram Jeff Javidzad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sprout Mortgage Coporation is a litigant

Latest cases where PRESTIGE DEFAULT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITCHER, RACHEL C.