Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 16:10:37 (UTC).

SHAHMIR NAUMAN VS U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 SHAHMIR NAUMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against U-HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3323

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAUMAN SHAHMIR

Defendants

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

U-HAUL OF HOLLYWOOD A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

AMERCO REAL ESTATE COMPANY A NEVADA CORPORATION

MATOS SUPATRA

U-HAUL CO OF LOS ANGELES WEST INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OUNJIAN ROBERT J.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shahmir Nauman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shahmir Nauman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shahmir Nauman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amerco Real Estate Company is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OUNJIAN, ROBERT J