This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2023 at 08:39:29 (UTC).

SHAGMAG, INC. VS STEPHEN MCHUGH

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 SHAGMAG, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STEPHEN MCHUGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0510

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAGMAG INC.

Defendant

MCHUGH STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDMAN JEREMY S

 

Court Documents

Judgment

7/18/2022: Judgment

Judgment

7/18/2022: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

7/18/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/18/2022

7/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/18/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Ruling

6/8/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STIPULATED JUDGMENT /PURSUANT TO TERMS ...)

6/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STIPULATED JUDGMENT /PURSUANT TO TERMS ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STIPULATED JUDGMENT /PURSUANT TO TERMS ...) OF 06/06/2022

6/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STIPULATED JUDGMENT /PURSUANT TO TERMS ...) OF 06/06/2022

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF THE: (1) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL GENERAL RELEASE; AND (2) STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

5/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF THE: (1) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL GENERAL RELEASE; AND (2) STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Motion for Stipulated Judgment

3/23/2022: Motion for Stipulated Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SALVATORE PICARIELLO IN SUPPORT OF DFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF THE: (1) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL GENERAL RELEASE; AND (2) STIPULATIO

3/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SALVATORE PICARIELLO IN SUPPORT OF DFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF THE: (1) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL GENERAL RELEASE; AND (2) STIPULATIO

Request for Dismissal

8/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR STEPHEN MCHUGH TO ANSWER

7/28/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR STEPHEN MCHUGH TO ANSWER

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

6/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review RE: Case on Purge List scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Defendant STEPHEN McHUGH against Plaintiff SHAGMAG, INC. on the Complaint filed by SHAGMAG, INC. on 06/01/2021 for attorney fees of $48,000.00 and costs of $1,961.65 for a total of $49,961.65.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: STEPHEN McHUGH (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: STEPHEN McHUGH (Defendant); As to: SHAGMAG, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/18/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Appearance Case Review RE: Case on Purge List scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/14/2022 08:45 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review RE: Case on Purge List scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Jeremy S Goldman (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Seth to S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SHAGMAG, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN McHUGH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHAGMAG, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHAGMAG, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kevin C. Brazile in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SHAGMAG, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHEN McHUGH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0510 Hearing Date: June 6, 2022 Dept: 20

Tentative Ruling

Judge Kevin C. Brazile

Department 20


Hearing Date: June 6, 2022

Case Name: Shagmag, Inc. v. McHugh, et al.

Case No.: *******0510

Matter: Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment

Moving Party: Defendant Stephen McHugh

Responding Party: Unopposed

Notice: OK


Ruling: The Motion is granted.

Moving party to give notice.

If counsel do not submit on the tentative, they are strongly

encouraged to appear by LACourtConnect rather than in person due to the COVID-19 pandemic.


Defendant Stephen McHugh seeks “[e]ntry of Judgment against Plaintiff SHAGMAG, INC. [ ] pursuant to the terms of the (1) Settlement Agreement and Mutual General Release [ ]; and (2) the Stipulation for Entry of Judgment in the amount of $48,000.00, interest at the rate of 10% per annum from the date of entry of Judgment, attorneys' fees, and costs.” This request is premised on Code Civ. Proc. 664.6.

The Court is authorized to enter judgment pursuant to a stipulated settlement. (Code Civ. Proc. 664.6.) In reviewing a motion to enforce a settlement, the Court determines “whether the parties entered into a valid and binding settlement.” (Hines v. Lukes (2008) 167 Cal.App.4th 1174, 1182.) “A settlement is enforceable under section 664.6 only if the parties agreed to all material settlement terms. [Citations.] The court ruling on the motion may consider the parties’ declarations and other evidence in deciding what terms the parties agreed to, and the court’s factual findings in this regard are reviewed under the substantial evidence standard. [Citations.] If the court determines that the parties entered into an enforceable settlement, it should grant the motion and enter a formal judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement.” (Id. at pp. 1182-1183; see also Osumi v. Sutton (2007) 151 Cal.App.4th 1355, 1357 [“Strong public policy in favor of the settlement of civil cases gives the trial court, which approves the settlement, the power to enforce it”].)

“[A] party moving for the entry of judgment pursuant to a settlement under Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6 need not establish a breach of contract to support relief under the statute.” (Hines v. Lukes (2008) 167 Cal.App.4th 1174, 1188.)

Because there appears to be a valid settlement between the parties and no opposition was filed, the Court will enter the terms of the parties’ settlement agreement as a judgment. (Code Civ. Proc. 664.6.)

Moving party to give notice.

If counsel do not submit on the tentative, they are strongly encouraged to appear by LACourtConnect rather than in person due to the COVID-19 pandemic.