This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 11:53:30 (UTC).

SHADEA CURRY BAHAR VS CLAUDIA CUNNINGHAM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 SHADEA CURRY BAHAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CLAUDIA CUNNINGHAM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6446

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAHAR SHADEA CURRY

Defendants

WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS U.S. INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION

CUNNINGHAM CLAUDIA DBA THE SOUND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PASTERNAK JEREMY DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

LOWE SHANDA

LARMOND MONIQUE S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/14/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/26/2021: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROTECTIVE][PROPOSED]

11/2/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROTECTIVE][PROPOSED]

Case Management Order

6/17/2021: Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/4/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/1/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

4/1/2021: Answer

Answer

4/2/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Shadea Curry Bahar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Protective Order; Filed by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff); Filed by Shadea Curry Bahar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Plaintiff); Filed by Shadea Curry Bahar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Defendant Claudia Cunningham dba The Sound); Filed by Claudia Cunningham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant Walt Disney Parks and Resorts US Inc to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint); Filed by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant Claudia Cunningham to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Claudia Cunningham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shadea Curry Bahar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Shadea Curry Bahar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shadea Curry Bahar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shadea Curry Bahar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shadea Curry Bahar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less