This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 23:27:58 (UTC).

SHADAY JOHNSON,, GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF SAGE ALLEN, A MINOR, ET AL. VS LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 SHADAY JOHNSON,, GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF SAGE ALLEN, A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1085

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON SHADAY GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF SAGE ALLEN A MINOR

Defendants

LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

YEPEZ MARIA

DOE EMMA

MACARTHUR ELEMENTARY SCHOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAMIDEH BELAL ESQ.

HAMIDEH BELAL GHALEB

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/8/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SAGE

1/25/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SAGE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/19/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SAGE

1/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SAGE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/11/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff); Sage Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sage); Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sage); Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff); Sage Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff); Sage Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff); Sage Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shaday Johnson,, Guardian Ad Litem of Sage Allen, a Minor (Plaintiff); Sage Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMIDEH BELAL ESQ.