This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2023 at 06:14:13 (UTC).

SHAD WITTEN VS CURBSTAND, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 SHAD WITTEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CURBSTAND, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6323

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WITTEN SHAD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHEN FONG CHYOU

CURBSTAND INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DE LOS SANTOS MACIAS EDGARDO

H & H BRAZILIAN STEAKHOUSE LLC

Cross Defendant

CURBSTAND INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'CONNOR MICHAEL PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

MILLINGTON KIMBERLY ANN

ZINDER JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

1/10/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

1/10/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

12/2/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/16/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/16/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Association of Attorney

11/9/2022: Association of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/17/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/17/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEANCE

10/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ADDRESSES FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

10/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ADDRESSES FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Cross-Complaint

10/17/2022: Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Order - ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/27/2022: Order - ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

7/27/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. LOPEZ

7/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. LOPEZ

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

6/27/2022: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2024
  • Hearing12/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Curbstand, Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Edgardo De Los Santos Macias (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: H & H Brazilian Steakhouse, LLC (Defendant); As to: Shad Witten (Plaintiff); Curbstand, Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Edgardo De Los Santos Macias (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- James D. Theodosopoulos (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Bremer Whyte Brown & Omeara, LLP. to Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara, LLP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- James D. Theodosopoulos (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara, LLP. to Bremer White Brown & O'Meara, LLP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Edgardo De Los Santos Macias (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Curbstand, Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on First Amended Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Shad Witten (Plaintiff); As to: Curbstand, Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Edgardo De Los Santos Macias (Defendant); Fong Chyou Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Shad Witten (Plaintiff); As to: Curbstand, Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Edgardo De Los Santos Macias (Defendant); Fong Chyou Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Shad Witten (Plaintiff); As to: Curbstand, Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Edgardo De Los Santos Macias (Defendant); Fong Chyou Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shad Witten (Plaintiff); As to: Curbstand, Inc., A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Edgardo De Los Santos Macias (Defendant); Fong Chyou Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less