This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 07:17:27 (UTC).

SHAD ALI VS ROBCAR CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 SHAD ALI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBCAR CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1451

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALI SHAD

Defendants

GAMIZ ANDREZ ERIVENTO MENDEZ

HUDSON SAFE - T - LITE RENTALS

KEMPER

ROBCAR CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AWAD RANDALL M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/26/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/26/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/26/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2024
  • Hearing09/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2024
  • Hearing03/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Shad Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Robcar Corporation (Defendant); HUDSON SAFE - T - LITE RENTALS (Defendant); ANDREZ ERIVENTO MENDEZ GAMIZ (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Shad Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Robcar Corporation (Defendant); HUDSON SAFE - T - LITE RENTALS (Defendant); ANDREZ ERIVENTO MENDEZ GAMIZ (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shad Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Robcar Corporation (Defendant); HUDSON SAFE - T - LITE RENTALS (Defendant); ANDREZ ERIVENTO MENDEZ GAMIZ (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robcar CorP; DBA : Hudson Safe-T-Lite Lite Rentals is a litigant

Latest cases where Kemper Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AWAD RANDALL M.