This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 03:08:55 (UTC).

S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC VS TWIN MED LLC

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 S F MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against TWIN MED LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6700

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC.

Defendant

TWIN MED LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MILLER BARONDESS LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/21/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

SUMMONS

5/21/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/23/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/23/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT) ON DEFENDANT TWIN MED, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

6/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT) ON DEFENDANT TWIN MED, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/22/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

8/21/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by S&F Management Company, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by S&F Management Company, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by S&F Management Company, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT) ON DEFENDANT TWIN MED, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by S&F Management Company, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

BRIAN A. PROCEL (State Bar No. 218657) bprocel@millerbarondess.com

ORIGINAL

2 || JEFFERY B. WHITE (State Bar No. 291086) jwhite@millerbarondess.com FILED 3 || MILLER BARONDESS, LLP : California - superior Court of 1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1000 pc,,.,m.. AF L.ac Anaeles 4 || Los Angeles, California 90067 _ Telephone: (310) 552-4400 JUN 112018 5 || Facsimile: (310) 552-8400 ‘ ~ Sherri R. Calyer, sazcaiive ushicer/Clerk of Cour 6 || Attorneys for Plaintiff 8\ o DRPULY S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC. YT Saaat 7

8 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

9 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT 10 11 || S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC., a CASE NO. BC706700 California corporation, |

12 PROOF OF SERVICE (SUMMONS &

Plaintiff, COMPLAINT) ON DEFENDANT TWIN 13 MED, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED V. 'LIABILITY COMPANY

14 TWIN MED, LLC, a Delaware limited

Assigned for All Purposes to: 15 || liability company,

Hon. Michael L. Stern, Dept. 62

ATTORNEYS AT LAW

1999 AVENUE OF THE STARS. SUITE 1000 LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90067

16 Defendant. Action Filed:

Tnal Date:

May 21, 2018 None Set

Tee: (310) 552-4400 Fax: (310) 552-8400

MILLER BARONDESS, LLP

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S&F MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TWIN MED LLC is a litigant