This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 00:59:11 (UTC).

SEYED JAMALI VS LEED ELECTRIC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 SEYED JAMALI filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against LEED ELECTRIC, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0092

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMALI SEYED

Defendants

LEED ELECTRIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PAKZAD ALI

ROESCH DARREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOUDERS J. SCOTT

Defendant Attorneys

BENAVIDES JOEL L.

ZFATY ISAAC RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

6/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Notice of Ruling

6/20/2019: Notice of Ruling

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

6/13/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/13/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Ruling

6/4/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED

5/23/2019: Order - ORDER RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/17/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/25/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO SET CASE FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO CORPORATIONS CODE 709; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SU

5/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO SET CASE FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO CORPORATIONS CODE 709; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SU

Opposition - DEFENDANT ALI PAKZADS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO CORPORATIONS CODE 709; DECLARATION OF ALI PAKZAD; DECLARATION OF

5/6/2019: Opposition - DEFENDANT ALI PAKZADS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO CORPORATIONS CODE 709; DECLARATION OF ALI PAKZAD; DECLARATION OF

Motion to Compel Arbitration

5/6/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Request for Judicial Notice

5/8/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

5/9/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION RE DEMURRER

5/9/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION RE DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION RE DEMURRER)

5/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION RE DEMURRER)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/15/2019: Complaint

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Post-Arbitration Status Conference) of 01/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO SET CASE FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO CORPORATIONS CODE 709; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO SET CASE FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO CORPORATIONS CODE 709; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Seyed Jamali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEED ELECTRIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOUDERS J. SCOTT