Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 11:27:35 (UTC).

SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CLOSET, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLOSET, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5185

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC

Defendants

JUN YONG S

CLOSET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PARK JONG YUN AKA BRIAN PARK

JUN YONG S.

ZOREF AARON

Q&A7 LLC

CLOSET INC.

YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAVAHERI MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/22/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • Hearing06/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (ON AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEVENTH STREET WAREHOUSE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CLOSET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAVAHERI MICHAEL