This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2023 at 19:49:52 (UTC).

SEVENTEEN TWENTY OIL COMPANY, ET AL. VS CHANTALLE ROCHEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 SEVENTEEN TWENTY OIL COMPANY, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHANTALLE ROCHEL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1875

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEVENTEEN TWENTY OIL COMPANY

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION DBA SHAWNAN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ROCHEL CHANTALLE

ROCHEL JACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAUMONT NANETTE M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

10/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/13/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

1/17/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/17/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/22/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Seventeen Twenty Oil Company, et al. on 10/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Seventeen Twenty Oil Company and Sialic Contractors Corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff); Sialic Contractors Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chantalle Rochel (Defendant); Jack Rochel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 03/28/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 03/14/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff); As to: Chantalle Rochel (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jack Rochel (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Jack Rochel; Chantalle Rochel; On the Complaint filed by Seventeen Twenty Oil Company, et al. on 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff); As to: Chantalle Rochel (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/31/2022; Service Cost: 58.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jack Rochel (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/31/2022; Service Cost: 39.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff); As to: Chantalle Rochel (Defendant); Jack Rochel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff); Sialic Contractors Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chantalle Rochel (Defendant); Jack Rochel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Seventeen Twenty Oil Company (Plaintiff); Sialic Contractors Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chantalle Rochel (Defendant); Jack Rochel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. in Department 200 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less