Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 11:57:00 (UTC).

SEVAK PETROSYAN VS MICHAEL HOLLOWAY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 SEVAK PETROSYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL HOLLOWAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6921

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETROSYAN SEVAK

Defendant

HOLLOWAY MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAGOPIAN SHANT HAROUT

Defendant Attorney

SCOFIELD ELYSE K

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/10/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/12/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael Holloway (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael Holloway (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sevak Petrosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sevak Petrosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sevak Petrosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sevak Petrosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOFIELD ELYSE K.