This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 00:52:05 (UTC).

SEVAK GHADIMIAN VS RONALD COSSEY

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 SEVAK GHADIMIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RONALD COSSEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9601

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GHADIMIAN SEVAK

Cross Defendants and Defendants

COSSEY RONALD

RAMIREZ ADAM

GHADIMIAN SEVAK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

RAMIREZ ADAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y.

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS ERIN M

RENAUD LISA L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/23/2021: PI General Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

4/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

6/1/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/1/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/18/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/18/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2024
  • Hearing03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Ronald Cossey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ronald Cossey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ronald Cossey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adam Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Adam Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Adam Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Adam Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sevak Ghadimian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sevak Ghadimian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Sevak Ghadimian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sevak Ghadimian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sevak Ghadimian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sevak Ghadimian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROCK CAMERON Y