This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 01:37:18 (UTC).

SETO ASSATOURIAN VS LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 SETO ASSATOURIAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1416

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSATOURIAN SETO

Defendants

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC.

LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESHISHYAN ROMINA

Defendant Attorney

HARVIN EMILY K.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Answer

7/12/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Seto Assatourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Seto Assatourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Seto Assatourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Seto Assatourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Seto Assatourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARVIN EMILY K.