Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2020 at 01:33:34 (UTC).

SETH ALSBURY, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CHARLY OKPARA, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 SETH ALSBURY, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHARLY OKPARA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5769

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALSBURY AN INDIVIDUAL SETH

Defendant

OKPARA AN INDIVIDUAL CHARLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.

Defendant Attorney

HANFF ROBERT ATLEE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE APRIL 24, 2020)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE APRIL 24, 2020)

Request for Dismissal

4/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE APRIL 24, 2020) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE APRIL 24, 2020) OF 04/14/2020

Notice of Settlement

3/4/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 03/04/2020

3/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 03/04/2020

Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

3/2/2020: Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

Answer

2/21/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/31/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/19/2019: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 3:21 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re April 24, 2020) of 04/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Seth Alsbury, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re April 24, 2020)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docketat 3:11 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Seth Alsbury, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 03/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOffer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998; Filed by Seth Alsbury, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Charly Okpara, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Seth Alsbury, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Seth Alsbury, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Seth Alsbury, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Seth Alsbury, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.