This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2022 at 08:59:55 (UTC).

SESCHWANA COSTELLO VS TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 SESCHWANA COSTELLO filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0369

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSTELLO SESCHWANA

Defendants

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LUCKY'S AUTO CREDIT LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TITANIUM FUNDS LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VILLAMIL ALEXANDER DBA AXEL RECOVERY AND TRANSPORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRATCH JOSHUA

Defendant Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

11/3/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Motion

10/13/2022: Notice of Motion

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/13/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.300 OF THE RULES OF COURT

10/13/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.300 OF THE RULES OF COURT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSHUA A. GRATCH ISO MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 3.300

10/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSHUA A. GRATCH ISO MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 3.300

Request for Judicial Notice

10/13/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAGE ISO MTC

10/12/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAGE ISO MTC

Motion to Compel Arbitration

10/12/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF OLIVES ISO MTC

10/12/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF OLIVES ISO MTC

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/30/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Mail

9/30/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Related Case

8/10/2022: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/31/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO TITANIUM FUNDS' OPP. TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

8/31/2022: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO TITANIUM FUNDS' OPP. TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION ISO REPLY TO TITANIUM FUNDS' OPP. TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

8/31/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION ISO REPLY TO TITANIUM FUNDS' OPP. TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Request for Judicial Notice

8/31/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • Hearing01/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Hearing12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Compelling Titanium Funds, LLC to Comply With Rule 3.3033 of the Rules of Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); LUCKY'S AUTO CREDIT, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); As to: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Compelling Titanium Funds, LLC to Comply With Rule 3.3033 of the Rules of Court scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Motion to Compel Titanium Funds, LLC to comply with Rule 3.300 of the Rules of Court; Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff); As to: TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Joshua A. Gratch ISO Motion to Compel Compliance With Rule 3.300; Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff); As to: TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); LUCKY'S AUTO CREDIT, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff); As to: TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); LUCKY'S AUTO CREDIT, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); Alexander Villamil (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Affidavit re Venue; Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff); As to: TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); LUCKY'S AUTO CREDIT, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); Alexander Villamil (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff); As to: TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); LUCKY'S AUTO CREDIT, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); Alexander Villamil (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Seschwana Costello (Plaintiff); As to: TITANIUM FUNDS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); LUCKY'S AUTO CREDIT, LLC, a Utah limited liability company (Defendant); Alexander Villamil (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TITANIUM FUNDS LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN