This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2022 at 07:39:51 (UTC).

SERVICES, LP, GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT VS BHATTACHARJYA, AUVEE

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 SERVICES, LP, GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against BHATTACHARJYA, AUVEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1627

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SERVICES LP GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT

Respondent

BHATTACHARJYA AUVEE

Other

CHAVEZ JUBILEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

3/21/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

3/21/2022: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

3/21/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

4/12/2022: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

4/12/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

4/12/2022: Proof of Service

Minute Order

4/12/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service of Order After by Mail.

4/14/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service of Order After by Mail.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service of Order After by Mail. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO