Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 06:43:42 (UTC).

SERRATOS, LUCY - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 SERRATOS, LUCY - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARRY, WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9296

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARRY, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANEZ STEVEN

Decedent

SERRATOS LUCY

Not Classified By Court

MADSEN RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorney

RYAN GREGORY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Letters (Initial)

12/30/2020: Letters (Initial)

Will - Admitted

12/10/2020: Will - Admitted

Minute Order

12/10/2020: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

12/15/2020: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Order - Probate

12/15/2020: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Order - Probate

Order - Probate

12/21/2020: Order - Probate

Supplement - Second Supplement to Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed and Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

12/8/2020: Supplement - Second Supplement to Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed and Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Proof - Holographic Instrument - Proof of Holographic Instrument

12/8/2020: Proof - Holographic Instrument - Proof of Holographic Instrument

Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed

12/2/2020: Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed

Proof of Subscribing Witness - Proof of Subscribing Witness

12/2/2020: Proof of Subscribing Witness - Proof of Subscribing Witness

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

11/12/2020: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Will Deposited - Holo 1 pg - Dated - 03/11/2020

11/18/2020: Will Deposited - Holo 1 pg - Dated - 03/11/2020

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

11/20/2020: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

11/6/2020: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder - Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Barry, William, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof - Holographic Instrument (Proof of Holographic Instrument )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketSupplement (Second Supplement to Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed and Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness (Proof of Subscribing Witness )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketWill Deposited (Holo 1 pg - Dated - 03/11/2020 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN GREGORY R.