Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 03:06:17 (UTC).

SERRANO, JUAN DIAZ VS POSAS, ADELFIA RACHEL ARIAS

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 SERRANO, JUAN DIAZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against POSAS, ADELFIA RACHEL ARIAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUHAS, MARK A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2622

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUHAS, MARK A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SERRANO JUAN DIAZ

Respondent

POSAS ADELFIA RACHEL ARIAS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

6/5/2020: Proof of Service

Minute Order

6/10/2020: Minute Order

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

5/20/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/20/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

5/20/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 13, Juhas, Mark A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less