Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 23:11:52 (UTC).

SEROP J. BEYLERIAN, ET AL. VS HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 SEROP J BEYLERIAN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4916

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEYLERIAN SEROP J.

SHANLIAN AVEDIS

Defendant

HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEZDIKIAN SAREEN

Defendant Attorney

GEORGE ERIC MARC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: ORDER OF REMAND)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: ORDER OF REMAND)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER OF REMAND) OF 05/25/2021

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER OF REMAND) OF 05/25/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT

5/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 04/12/2021

4/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 04/12/2021

Status Report - DEFENDANT'S STATUS REPORT REGARDING STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

4/5/2021: Status Report - DEFENDANT'S STATUS REPORT REGARDING STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

Initial Status Conference Order

1/5/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

1/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/11/2021

1/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/11/2021

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

12/23/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/24/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 3:39 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Order of Remand) of 05/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: Order of Remand)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court); Filed by Serop J. Beylerian (Plaintiff); Avedis Shanlian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of Removal to Federal Court) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal to Federal Court) of 04/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Status Report regarding status of removed case; Filed by Hillstone Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 1:55 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/05/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDefendants' Notice to Adverse Party and State Court of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Hillstone Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Serop J. Beylerian (Plaintiff); Avedis Shanlian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Serop J. Beylerian (Plaintiff); Avedis Shanlian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Serop J. Beylerian (Plaintiff); Avedis Shanlian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Serop J. Beylerian (Plaintiff); Avedis Shanlian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILLSTONE RESTARAUNT GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEORGE ERIC M. ESQ.