This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2022 at 13:29:08 (UTC).

SERGO KUTELIA VS JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 SERGO KUTELIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9817

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUTELIA SERGO

Defendants

JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

JAMES RIVER MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GHENCIU VLAD RAUL

SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/21/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/21/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/21/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/21/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

5/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sergo Kutelia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sergo Kutelia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sergo Kutelia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sergo Kutelia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sergo Kutelia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sergo Kutelia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less