This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2021 at 00:19:23 (UTC).

SERGIO ROSALES, ET AL. VS KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 SERGIO ROSALES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9364

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSALES ALEJANDRO

ROSALES SERGIO

Defendants

CARSON CJ LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CAR PROS KIA

KIA MOTORS AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE CHARLES J.

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

3/23/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

2/4/2020: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/7/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

1/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

12/4/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/6/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/6/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/1/2019: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation And Protective Order); Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Carson CJ, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Carson CJ, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kia Motors America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Carson CJ, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sergio Rosales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARSON CJ LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CAR PROS KIA is a litigant

Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE CHARLES J.