This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2022 at 18:50:54 (UTC).

SERGIO RODRIGUEZ VS CALIFORNIA TESTING & INSPECTIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 SERGIO RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA TESTING INSPECTIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4465

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ SERGIO

Defendant

CALIFORNIA TESTING & INSPECTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JACE HYUN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

4/29/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sergio Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sergio Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JACE H. ESQ.