Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2020 at 19:50:09 (UTC).

SERGIO RAMIREZ VS GOLDEN WEST ENVELOPE AND PRINTING INC ET A

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 SERGIO RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GOLDEN WEST ENVELOPE AND PRINTING INC ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RITA MILLER and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5790

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RITA MILLER

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMIREZ SERGIO

Defendants and Respondents

MILNE ROBERT

GOLDEN WEST ENVELOPE AND PRINTING INC

DOES 1-50

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MOON & YANG APC

Defendant Attorney

JEREMY D. JASS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

11/7/2017: Minute Order -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION ; ETC

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION ; ETC

SUMMONS -

3/29/2017: SUMMONS -

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDICIAL OFFICER

4/3/2017: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDICIAL OFFICER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

4/10/2017: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/13/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RULING

4/14/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/19/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN WEST ENVELOPE AND PRINTING, INC AND ROBERT MILNE

5/1/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN WEST ENVELOPE AND PRINTING, INC AND ROBERT MILNE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/10/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/21/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/25/2017: Minute Order -

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • Docketat 08:59 AM in Department 16; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN WEST ENVELOPE AND PRINTING, INC AND ROBERT MILNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Golden West Envelope and Printing, Inc (Defendant); Robert Milne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Sergio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 12; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sergio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Sergio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDICIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Sergio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sergio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION ; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less