This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2020 at 07:44:22 (UTC).

SERGIO PACHECO,III, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DARLENE TELLEZ VS EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 SERGIO PACHECO,III, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, DARLENE TELLEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4593

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERGIO PACHECO III A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM DARLENE TELLEZ

Defendants

KASSAR M.D. SAMUEL

EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WOODGLEN OB/GYN MEDICAL GROUP A CA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

KASSAR SAMUEL M.D.

WOODGLEN OB/GYN MEDICAL GROUP

EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL

Not Classified By Court

TELLEZ DARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEL BRUCE G

Defendant Attorneys

BLESSEY RAYMOND L.

ROSA STEPHEN ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

6/23/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/1/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/1/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/1/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/10/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Demand for Jury Trial

5/4/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/4/2020: Answer

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SERGIO

3/30/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SERGIO

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SERGIO

3/30/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SERGIO

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/6/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

4/6/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/6/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/8/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/8/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/8/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Samuel Kassar, M.D. (Defendant); Woodglen OB/Gyn Medical Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Samuel Kassar, M.D. (Defendant); Woodglen OB/Gyn Medical Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Woodglen OB/Gyn Medical Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sergio); Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sergio); Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sergio Pacheco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEL, BRUCE G