This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 14:54:09 (UTC).

SERGIO GOMEZ VS SERVICE KING PAINT & BODY LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 SERGIO GOMEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SERVICE KING PAINT BODY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7969

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GOMEZ SERGIO

Defendants and Respondents

DIAZ TONY

SERVICE KING PAINT & BODY LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

SERVICE KING COLLISION REPAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MATERN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LAWRENCE AMY BETH

JAMES JOHNNIE ALPHONSO

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT SERVICE KING PAINT & BODY, LLC'S NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6, ETC

3/5/2018: DEFENDANT SERVICE KING PAINT & BODY, LLC'S NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6, ETC

Minute Order

4/2/2018: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/3/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

5/8/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/21/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

5/24/2018: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/24/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Brief

1/22/2019: Brief

Motion for Summary Judgment

1/22/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/22/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/30/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice

1/30/2019: Notice

Motion to Continue

3/13/2019: Motion to Continue

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/11/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/11/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 40; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Motion to Continue (Defendant Tony Diaz's Notice of Continuance of Motion for Summary Judgement, or Alternatively for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Tony Diaz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines; [Proposed] Order); Filed by Service King Paint & Body, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Service King Paint & Body, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Service King Paint & Body, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Service King Paint & Body, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Sergio Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Sergio Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. SEXUAL HARASSMENT IN VIOLATION OF CAL. GOV'T CODE 12940(J) (FEHA) ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE KING COLLISION REPAIR CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE KING PAINT & BODY, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATERN, MATTHEW J