Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 10:09:20 (UTC).

SERGIO ESPINOZA VS CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 SERGIO ESPINOZA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9878

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOZA SERGIO

Defendants

DOE LIAM

CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGADZHANYAN SEROP

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED NOT ENTERED-DISMISSAL REQUIRES A SIGNATURE.

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED NOT ENTERED-DISMISSAL REQUIRES A SIGNATURE.

Request for Dismissal

4/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/22/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sergio Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (filed not entered-dismissal requires a signature.); Filed by Sergio Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Sergio Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sergio Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sergio Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sergio Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sergio Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Pizza Kitchen, Inc. D/B/A California Pizza Kitchen is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGADZHANYAN SEROP