This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 08:24:25 (UTC).

SERGIO CHAVEZ VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 SERGIO CHAVEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6030

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ SERGIO

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMITH DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/18/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/18/2021

8/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/18/2021

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/20/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/15/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Sergio Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 40; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Sergio Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sergio Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sergio Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sergio Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sergio Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSMITH DAVID