This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2023 at 01:40:21 (UTC).

SERGEI SIMAKOV VS CENTRAL ESCROW, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 SERGEI SIMAKOV filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CENTRAL ESCROW, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2734

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMAKOV SERGEI

Defendants

CENTRAL ESCROW INC.

NH MOUNTAIN LP FDBA NEW HAMPSHIRE RAGGED MOUNTAIN RESORT INVESTMENT LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STOK ROBERT A.

CARTEE ANTHONY B.

ROBBINS DAVID M.

SANDLER THEODORE

Defendant Attorneys

FREEDMAN MICHAEL G.

WONG MAURICE K.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY THEODOR...)

9/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY THEODOR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY THEODOR...) OF 09/29/2022

9/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY THEODOR...) OF 09/29/2022

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT CENTRAL ESCROW, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/21/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT CENTRAL ESCROW, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

9/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/2/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

8/31/2022: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT

8/31/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT

Request for Judicial Notice

8/19/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/19/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/18/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER

8/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

7/19/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/30/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE RE D...)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE RE D...)

Order - ORDER ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND

5/18/2022: Order - ORDER ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Atty Theodor...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Atty Theodor...) of 09/29/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Atty Theodore Sandler to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Sergei Simakov [407706755559]*- scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 updated: Result Date to 09/29/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff), NH Mountain, LP (Defendant), Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant) to Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff), Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant), NH Mountain, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - Entire action/complaint, without prejudice: Filed By: Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Name Extension: - Entire action/complaint, without prejudice; Result Date: 09/21/2022; As To Parties changed from Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant), NH Mountain, LP (Defendant), Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff) to Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant), Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff), NH Mountain, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint; Filed by: NH Mountain, LP (Defendant); As to: Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff); Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Demurrer by Defendant Central Escrow, Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Withdrawal of Demurrer by Defendant Central Escrow, Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint: Name Extension changed from NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT CENTRAL ESCROW, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT to of Withdrawal of Demurrer by Defendant Central Escrow, Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Document changed from Notice of Lodging (name extension) to Notice (name extension); As To Parties: Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice - Defendant NH Mountain LP's Notice of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint: Name Extension changed from of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint to - Defendant NH Mountain LP's Notice of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint; As To Parties changed from Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff), Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant) to Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff), Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike by Deft Central Escrow, Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [336372237342]*- scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from NH Mountain, LP, (Defendant), Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant) to NH Mountain, LP (Defendant), Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant), NH Mountain, LP, (Defendant) to Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant), NH Mountain, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff); As to: Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant); NH Mountain, LP, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff); As to: Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant); NH Mountain, LP, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard L. Fruin in Department 15 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sergei Simakov (Plaintiff); As to: Central Escrow, Inc. (Defendant); NH Mountain, LP, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL ESCROW INC. is a litigant