This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 03:31:37 (UTC).

SERGE BUENO VS MATHEW ROSENBERG

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 SERGE BUENO filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MATHEW ROSENBERG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4288

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUENO SERGE

Defendant

ROSENBERG MATHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVIAN FARHAD

Defendant Attorney

BRACY ALLISON R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/26/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Request for Judicial Notice

6/9/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION OF ALLISON R. BRACY, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW ROSENBERGS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION OF ALLISON R. BRACY, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW ROSENBERGS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/4/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

8/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF SERGE BUENOS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MATHEW ROSENGERGS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF SERGE BUENOS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MATHEW ROSENGERGS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFF SERGE BUENOS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MATHEW ROSENGERGS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT); Filed by Serge Bueno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by Mathew Rosenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Serge Bueno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mathew Rosenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mathew Rosenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION OF ALLISON R. BRACY, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW ROSENBERGS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT); Filed by Mathew Rosenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Mathew Rosenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Mathew Rosenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Serge Bueno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Serge Bueno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Serge Bueno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Serge Bueno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVIAN FARHAD