This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2020 at 15:18:23 (UTC).

SERENA FERRARO VS GREGORY PHILIPOT

Case Summary

On 05/08/2018 SERENA FERRARO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GREGORY PHILIPOT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5572

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FERRARO SERENA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

PHILIPOT GREGORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

VANNI GREGORY R.

Defendant Attorney

WULTERIN SHAYNE L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED TRIAL DATES

4/20/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED TRIAL DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 REGARDING APPLICABILITY OF COLLATERAL SOURCE RULE RELATING TO FUTURE MEDICAL EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RAFFI H. OHANIAN

3/18/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 REGARDING APPLICABILITY OF COLLATERAL SOURCE RULE RELATING TO FUTURE MEDICAL EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RAFFI H. OHANIAN

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO PAST MEDICAL PAYMENTS AND HEALTH INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RAFFI H. OHANIAN

3/18/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO PAST MEDICAL PAYMENTS AND HEALTH INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RAFFI H. OHANIAN

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO ALLOW ELECTRONIC PRESENTATION OF OPENING STATEMENT

3/18/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO ALLOW ELECTRONIC PRESENTATION OF OPENING STATEMENT

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE SUB ROSA EVIDENCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RAFFI H. OHANIAN

3/18/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE SUB ROSA EVIDENCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RAFFI H. OHANIAN

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO ALLOW COUNSEL TO DISCUSS SPECIFIC SUMS DURING VOIR DIRE, AND STRIKE FOR CAUSE JURORS WHO STATE THAT THEY CANNOT AWARD A SUM OF DAMAGES EVEN IF THE EVIDENCE

3/18/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO ALLOW COUNSEL TO DISCUSS SPECIFIC SUMS DURING VOIR DIRE, AND STRIKE FOR CAUSE JURORS WHO STATE THAT THEY CANNOT AWARD A SUM OF DAMAGES EVEN IF THE EVIDENCE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE TO "FALL" IN DR. FRAIPONT'S RECORDS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RAFFI H. OHANIAN

3/18/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE TO "FALL" IN DR. FRAIPONT'S RECORDS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RAFFI H. OHANIAN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER VACATING OSC, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES; AND NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

3/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER VACATING OSC, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES; AND NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Motion to Continue Trial Date

3/25/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

12/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/24/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/9/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

DECLARATION OF GREGORY R. VANNI RE SERVICE OF COMPLAINT

7/9/2018: DECLARATION OF GREGORY R. VANNI RE SERVICE OF COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

5/8/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/8/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • Hearing04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Hearing04/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Serena Ferraro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketReply (TO PLAINTIFF?S COUNSEL?S DECLARATION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES); Filed by Gregory Philipot (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Gregory R. Vanni in Reply to Defendant Gregory Phlipot's Motion to Continue Trial); Filed by Serena Ferraro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Gregory R. Vanni (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Gregory Philipot (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gregory Philipot (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Serena Ferraro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Serena Ferraro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF GREGORY R. VANNI RE SERVICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Serena Ferraro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705572    Hearing Date: August 03, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SERENA FERRARO,

Plaintiff,

vs.

GREGORY PHILIPOT, et al.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: BC705572

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

August 3, 2020

On May 8, 2018, plaintiff Serena Ferraro filed this action against defendant Gregory Philipot.  Defendant seeks an order continuing trial and all trial-related dates to at least July 2021 A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered.  (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).)  The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause.  (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

The jury trial scheduled for April 27, 2020 was vacated per a minute order dated March 18, 2020.  A trial setting conference was set for July 27, 2020 but was subsequently vacated as well.  Thus, there is no trial date set for this case for this Court to continue.  The Motion is MOOT. 

Nevertheless, the Court takes this opportunity to set the trial date for this case on July 27, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 27.  The Final Status Conference is scheduled for July 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 27.  All discovery and motion cut-off deadlines will be based on the new trial date. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 3rd day of August 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. 

Judge of the Superior Court