Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 08:45:57 (UTC).

SEPULVEDA VICTORY ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP VS ORTHO MATTRESS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 SEPULVEDA VICTORY ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ORTHO MATTRESS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8255

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEPULVEDA VICTORY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

ORTHO MATTRESS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEINBERG MATTHEW S.

Defendant Attorney

NAHAI BEHZAD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Answer

9/10/2020: Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/11/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/30/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/28/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sepulveda Victory Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause); Filed by Sepulveda Victory Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ortho Mattress Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Sepulveda Victory Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sepulveda Victory Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sepulveda Victory Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sepulveda Victory Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORTHO MATTRESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINBERG MATTHEW STEPHAN