This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:43:01 (UTC).

SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA LLC VS CITY OF LOS ANGELE

Case Summary

On 04/24/2018 SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3410

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA LLC

Defendants

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

SOUTH LOS ANGELES AREA PLANNING

IRVING THEODORE L. IN HIS OFFICIAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARLSEN NICKI

Defendant Attorney

TOBKIN JENNIFER KATHLEEN

Respondent Attorney

TOBKIN JENNIFER DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

5/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/23/2018: Minute Order

STIPULATION TO 1) CONTINUE DEADLINES TO PREPARE AND CERTIFY THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD; AND 2) STAY COMPLAINT CAUSES OF ACTION; ORDER ON SAME

5/24/2018: STIPULATION TO 1) CONTINUE DEADLINES TO PREPARE AND CERTIFY THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD; AND 2) STAY COMPLAINT CAUSES OF ACTION; ORDER ON SAME

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

5/24/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

Minute Order

5/24/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

REQUEST FOR HEARING

6/19/2018: REQUEST FOR HEARING

Minute Order

7/19/2018: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF ANGELA JOHNSON MESZAROS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION; AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (PROPOSED OR

7/19/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF ANGELA JOHNSON MESZAROS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION; AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (PROPOSED OR

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR INTERVENTION; DECLARATION OF NICK! CARLSEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

7/19/2018: OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR INTERVENTION; DECLARATION OF NICK! CARLSEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

7/19/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

NOTICE OF RULING

7/23/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

JOINT UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION OF RESPONDENTS, PETITIONER, AND PROPOSED INTERVENOR RE STIPULATION TO 1) CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, 2) STAY ALL COURT PROCEEDINGS, AND 3) CONSENT TO INTERV

9/11/2018: JOINT UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION OF RESPONDENTS, PETITIONER, AND PROPOSED INTERVENOR RE STIPULATION TO 1) CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, 2) STAY ALL COURT PROCEEDINGS, AND 3) CONSENT TO INTERV

ORDER

9/11/2018: ORDER

Minute Order

9/11/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

5/29/2019: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

5/29/2019: Minute Order

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Extend Stay And Continue The June 4, 2019, Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Los Angeles, City Of (Defendant); South Los Angeles Area Planning (Defendant); Theodore L. in his official Irving (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 85; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Sentinel Peak Resources California LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Sentinel Peak Resources California LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sentinel Peak Resources California LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketPETITIONER AND PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR CONSTITUTIONAL VIOLATIONS, IN VERSE CONDEMNATION, AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

' FILE

NICKI CARLSEN (State Bar No. 151222) Superior COH—;tgglifomi ) MAX ROLLENS (State Bar No. 308984) County of Los Angeles

ALSTON & BIRD LLP

333 South Hope Street, 16th Floor /' MAY 012018 Los Angeles, CA 90071-1410 Sherri K. arter, cxecutive Ufficer/Cler’

Telephone: 213-576-1000 ) Facs]ijmile: 213-576-1100 ' BY—___E:}I:&J%———v Deput:

Jenn¥er De Luna

Attorneys for Plaintiff

SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA LLC SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES Case No.: BS173410 P~ %9 CALIFORNIA LLC, | Petitioner and Plaintiff, PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AND VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT

V. OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT

- | FOR CONSTITUTIONAL

CITY OF LOS ANGELES: SOUTH LOS VIOLATIONS, INVERSE ANGELES AREA PLANNING CONDEMNATION, AND DAMAGES

COMMISSION; THEODORE L. IRVING, in his official capacity as Assistant Zoning Administrator,

Respondefits and Defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant