This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 07:52:45 (UTC).

SENORINA MARTINEZ LOPEZ VS MIRNA VASQUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 SENORINA MARTINEZ LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MIRNA VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0484

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOPEZ SENORINA MARTINEZ

Defendants and Respondents

SOTO MIRNA

DOES 1 TO 10

VASQUEZ MIRNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BROWN ASSOCIATES

JAIME VICTOR H ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

1/14/2019: Minute Order

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

1/17/2019: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

1/29/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/29/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

1/29/2019: Notice of Ruling

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

7/31/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) STRICT LIABILITY ;ETC

7/31/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) STRICT LIABILITY ;ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Senorina Martinez Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Senorina Martinez Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Senorina Martinez Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by Mirna Vasquez (Defendant); Mirna Soto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Senorina Martinez Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Senorina Martinez Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) STRICT LIABILITY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Senorina Martinez Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC670484    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SENORINA MARTINEZ LOPEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MIRNA VASQUEZ, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC670484

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

October 24, 2019

Plaintiff’s attorney of record, Victor H. Jaime, seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been an irreparable breakdown in the attorney-client relationship such that further representation is not possible.  Counsel declares he served the moving papers on his client via mail at a confirmed address.  Counsel has filed proof of service on his client and on all other parties to the action. 

The motion is unopposed and granted; the ruling is effective upon filing proof of service of the final order.  The Court notes that there is an OSC re: dismissal on calendar on 11/19/19.  The Court urges Plaintiff to act expediently to retain a new attorney if she wishes to protect her interests in connection with the case.   

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.