This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 17:35:52 (UTC).

SEMYON GINZBURG VS HERCULES INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 SEMYON GINZBURG filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against HERCULES INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9709

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GINZBURG SEMYON

Defendants

MCDONALD JAMES A. JR.

HERCULES INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HERCULES INVESTMENTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LINDEMANN BLAKE J

LINDEMANN BLAKE J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/22/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BLAKE J. LINDEMANN RE: OSC FOR SERVICE

7/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BLAKE J. LINDEMANN RE: OSC FOR SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED OSC RE: SERVICE

8/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED OSC RE: SERVICE

Case Management Statement

9/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/9/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/9/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendants Hercules Investments, LLC and James A. McDonald, Jr.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendants Hercules Investments, LLC and James A. McDonald, Jr.) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUED OSC RE: SERVICE); Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF BLAKE J. LINDEMANN RE: OSC FOR SERVICE); Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Semyon Ginzburg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERCULES INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDEMANN BLAKE J.