This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2019 at 00:50:50 (UTC).

SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC. VS WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0420

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES INC.

Defendant

WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEASE JANELLE

Defendant Attorney

BENDER RON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/20/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/17/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR RECOVERY OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, FROM COMPLAINT ONLY

6/27/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR RECOVERY OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, FROM COMPLAINT ONLY

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/12/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JANELLE M. DEASE

8/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JANELLE M. DEASE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LIANA SHAGINYAN

8/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LIANA SHAGINYAN

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

9/9/2019: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY CODE

9/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY CODE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/6/2019: Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment

9/6/2019: Default Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Filing of Petition for Relief Under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code); Filed by West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Liana Shaginyan); Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Janelle M. Dease); Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice as to the First Cause of Action for Recovery of Personal Property, From Complaint ONLY); Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less