This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 23:21:50 (UTC).

SEJO, LLC VS ARTHUR ASLANIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 SEJO, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARTHUR ASLANIAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0998

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEJO LLC DBA JOHNSTONE SUPPLY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ASLANIAN ARTHUR

LJ PROPERTIES INC.

NOHO URBAN WEST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ABRAMSON JOEY R.

SNYDER RYAN J.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Settlement

1/14/2022: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

1/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/21/2022

1/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/21/2022

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

6/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docketat 10:06 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) of 01/21/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SEJO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sejo LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LJ PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER RYAN J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABRAMSON JOE R