Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 05:01:36 (UTC).

SEGOVIA, VIRGINIA GOMEZ VS SEGOVIA ALANIS, JAVIER ENRIQUE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 SEGOVIA, VIRGINIA GOMEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SEGOVIA ALANIS, JAVIER ENRIQUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0042

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEGOVIA VIRGINIA GOMEZ

Respondent

SEGOVIA ALANIS JAVIER ENRIQUE

 

Court Documents

Request - Enter Default FL165

4/12/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Default FL170

4/12/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

4/12/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

FL_General Family Law - FL - Certificate of Mailing

4/28/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Certificate of Mailing

Proof of Service of Summons - Amended - Served: 02/20/21

4/2/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Amended - Served: 02/20/21

Proof of Service of Summons

3/9/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

3/9/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/13/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/13/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Summons

1/13/2021: Summons

Declaration - Income and Expense

1/13/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

1/13/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Torrance

1/14/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Torrance

Notice - Case Assignment

1/14/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/14/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Package Received-Supplemental (Fwd to Dept. 11 for processing on 04/28/21. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Amended - Served: 02/20/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less