This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2023 at 05:53:32 (UTC).

SEEMA MALIK VS BROOKFIELD PROPERTY REIT INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 SEEMA MALIK filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BROOKFIELD PROPERTY REIT INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0575

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALIK SEEMA

Defendants

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CA INC.

BROOKFIELD PROPERTY REIT INC.

MILLARD MALL SERVICES INC.

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CRAWFORD SHELBY B

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/3/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL, SET ONE; SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; AND REQUESTS FOR

10/11/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL, SET ONE; SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; AND REQUESTS FOR

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/29/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/29/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/29/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Substitution of Attorney

4/19/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

4/8/2022: Answer

Answer

4/8/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/8/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/25/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Seema Malik on 01/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Seema Malik as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Seema Malik (Plaintiff); As to: Brookfield Property REIT Inc. (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Management (CA) Inc. (Defendant); Millard Mall Services, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL, SET ONE; SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; Filed by: Brookfield Properties Retail Inc. (Defendant); As to: Seema Malik (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 10/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 10/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 10/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Brookfield Property REIT Inc. (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Management (CA) Inc. (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Retail Inc. (Defendant); As to: Seema Malik (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Seema Malik (Plaintiff); As to: Brookfield Property REIT Inc. (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Management (CA) Inc. (Defendant); Millard Mall Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Seema Malik (Plaintiff); As to: Brookfield Property REIT Inc. (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Management (CA) Inc. (Defendant); Millard Mall Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Seema Malik (Plaintiff); As to: Brookfield Property REIT Inc. (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Management (CA) Inc. (Defendant); Millard Mall Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less