This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 09:58:53 (UTC).

SEDA KASAMANYAN VS MARSHALLS OF CA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 SEDA KASAMANYAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against MARSHALLS OF CA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9233

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KASAMANYAN SEDA

Defendants

DOE ROXANNE

MARSHALLS OF CA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

T.J. MAXX OF CA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

Defendant Attorney

YUREK WILSON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/9/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/4/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/4/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2024
  • Hearing10/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marshalls of CA, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Marshalls of CA, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Seda Kasamanyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Seda Kasamanyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Seda Kasamanyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Seda Kasamanyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARSHALLS OF CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where T.J. MAXX OF CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN