This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 05:40:37 (UTC).

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS SOUTHWEST WINE & SPIRITS LLC AND, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTHWEST WINE SPIRITS LLC AND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2922

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SOUTHWEST WINE & SPIRITS LLC AND DBA WALLY'S WINE & SPIRITS AND DBA WALLY'S VINOTECA

1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE AND DOES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRES TIMOTHY CARL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER APPLYING PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF LIQU...)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER APPLYING PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF LIQU...)

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR ORDER APPLYING PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF LIQUOR LICENSE IN SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (TRANSFER BY RECEIVER SALE OF INTEREST IN LIQUOR LICENSE) AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IN

4/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR ORDER APPLYING PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF LIQUOR LICENSE IN SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (TRANSFER BY RECEIVER SALE OF INTEREST IN LIQUOR LICENSE) AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IN

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/30/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Default Judgment

11/18/2020: Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPLYING PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF LIQUOR LICENSE IN SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

11/19/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPLYING PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF LIQUOR LICENSE IN SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/22/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/17/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Applying Proceeds from Sale of Liquor License in Satisfaction of Judgment (Transfer by Receiver Sale of Interest in Liquor License) and Injunctive Relief in Aid of Receiver /Filed by (Plaintiff)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Motion for Order Applying Proceeds From Sale of Liquor License In Satisfaction of Judgment (Transfer by Receiver Sale Of Interest in Liquor License) and Injunctive Relief in aid of Receiver off Calendar); Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Applying Proceeds from Sale of Liqu...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (Applying Proceeds from Sale of Liquor License in Satisfaction of Judgment); Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Security National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST WINE & SPIRITS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRES TIMOTHY CARL