This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 04:08:11 (UTC).

SECURITY FIRST BANK, A CHARTERED COMMUNITY BANKING CORPORATION VS IRINA BARSAMYAN

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 SECURITY FIRST BANK, A CHARTERED COMMUNITY BANKING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IRINA BARSAMYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0162

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY FIRST BANK A CHARTERED COMMUNITY BANKING CORPORATION

Defendant

BARSAMYAN IRINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACLEOD JAMES

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/2/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • Hearing07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Hearing07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SECURITY FIRST BANK, a Chartered Community Banking Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SECURITY FIRST BANK, a Chartered Community Banking Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SECURITY FIRST BANK, a Chartered Community Banking Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SECURITY FIRST BANK, a Chartered Community Banking Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SECURITY FIRST BANK, a Chartered Community Banking Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.