This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2022 at 03:57:08 (UTC).

SEAN TABIBIAN, ET AL. VS MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 SEAN TABIBIAN, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MONTAGE HOTELS RESORTS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1936

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EBRAHIMIAN SHAWN

TABIBIAN SEAN

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

MAYBOURNE BEVERLY HILLS OPERATOR LLC

MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EBRAHIMIAN JONATHAN

Defendant Attorney

KAWAHITO JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/15/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

2/18/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SEAN TABIBIAN (Plaintiff); SHAWN EBRAHIMIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SEAN TABIBIAN (Plaintiff); SHAWN EBRAHIMIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SEAN TABIBIAN (Plaintiff); SHAWN EBRAHIMIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SEAN TABIBIAN (Plaintiff); SHAWN EBRAHIMIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS LLC is a litigant